U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Project Patch, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Return Mail]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Order]
  • November 06, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 17, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • May 16, 2017: [Case Transferred Out - District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.