U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00214
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Leach
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • May 04, 2020: [Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order Lifting Stay]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order Staying Case]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order]
  • January 18, 2018: [Stay]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 15, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 10, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 05, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • June 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 19, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 17, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.