U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00215
  • Case Name: Jones v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 07, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • August 14, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 14, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 14, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • August 09, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 04, 2018: [Appellants Reply Brief]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 13, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 31, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order]
  • October 31, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • October 18, 2017: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • October 16, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • October 16, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 15, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 15, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 11, 2017: [Errata]
  • September 11, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • September 11, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 21, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 13, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • June 05, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • May 24, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 18, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 18, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 18, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • May 18, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • May 18, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.