U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Handleson v. Corizon Regional Medical Director et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Letter]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [USCA Order]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 07, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Request]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Strike]
  • September 26, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 26, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2018: [Reconsideration]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • July 24, 2018: [Stay]
  • July 24, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 05, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order]
  • June 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2018: [Letter]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 25, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 19, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 19, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 19, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 19, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.