U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Widmyer et al v. Lapin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Court's Certificate of Service]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 22, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • May 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 19, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • May 19, 2017: [Third Party Complaint]
  • May 19, 2017: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • May 19, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.