U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00219
  • Case Name: Childs v. J&D Restaurants, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 02, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 04, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 04, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • February 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 08, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 14, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • June 13, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 12, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 06, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 23, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 23, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.