U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. NW Creative Solutions, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Intervene]
  • February 20, 2018: [Intervenor Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • May 24, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.