U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00222
  • Case Name: Garton v. BWXT Technical Services Group, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • January 07, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • January 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2019
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 24, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 10, 2019: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 10, 2019: [Seal]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Declaration]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sealed Motion]
  • March 08, 2019: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • March 08, 2019: [Seal]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 30, 2018: [Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 27, 2018: [Declaration]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • June 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 26, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • October 26, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Litigation Order]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 22, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 16, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • August 08, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 08, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 08, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 19, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 24, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • May 24, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • May 23, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.