U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00223
  • Case Name: Williams v. Brooks et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2019
  • December 26, 2019: [Letter]
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
November, 2018
  • November 08, 2018: [USCA Order]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [USCA Order]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 20, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 20, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 28, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 06, 2018: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • June 06, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 23, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 23, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 03, 2018: [Supplement]
  • May 03, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 03, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Supplement]
  • April 23, 2018: [Clarify]
  • April 20, 2018: [Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 20, 2018: [Sanctions]
  • April 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • April 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 10, 2018: [Compel]
  • April 06, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 08, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 08, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 07, 2018: [Stay]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • January 29, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • January 24, 2018: [Withdraw]
  • January 12, 2018: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • January 11, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 14, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 06, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 06, 2017: [Compel]
May, 2017
  • May 24, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 24, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 24, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 24, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.