U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00224
  • Case Name: McCarver et al v. Purina Animal Nutrition, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 01, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 10, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Litigation Order]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 19, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 26, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • May 26, 2017: [Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 25, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • May 24, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.