U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00225
  • Case Name: CARRERA-GARCIA v. Kelly et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 09, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • June 19, 2018: [Discovery Plan]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Litigation Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2018: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 26, 2018: [Order]
  • March 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 14, 2018: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • March 13, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 06, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • March 06, 2018: [File Excess Pages]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • February 21, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • February 20, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • February 02, 2018: [Letter]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Consent Filed]
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Summons Issued]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 30, 2017: [Supplement]
  • May 24, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.