U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00229
  • Case Name: McDonald et al v. American Rigging & Fabricating Services, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2018: [Judgment - Default]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Default Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 18, 2017: [Entry of Default]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 26, 2017: [Status Report]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • May 25, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • May 25, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.