U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Franco v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 09, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order]
  • September 21, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 22, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 02, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 02, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 13, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 12, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 22, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order]
  • May 25, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.