U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Jenson v. Huerta
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 25, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Writ of Mandamus]
  • May 25, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.