U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00227
  • Case Name: Grove v. Migliori et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • December 21, 2017: [Joinder]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • December 13, 2017: [Return Mail]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • November 28, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution]
  • November 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • October 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 16, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 16, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • June 27, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 25, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 25, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.