U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00226
  • Case Name: Arrats v. Madden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Reopening Case]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2017: [Receipt]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 25, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • May 25, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 25, 2017: [Complaint]
  • May 25, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.