U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Moseley et al v. Suzuki Motor Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 17, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 17, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 11, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • November 14, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 14, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2017: [Summons Issued]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 01, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.