U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Molina-Ruiz v. Corizon Health Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 30, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Order]
  • May 02, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • January 04, 2018: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice of Appearance]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • December 05, 2017: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order]
  • December 04, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • December 04, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • December 04, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Request]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Request]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 30, 2017: [Request]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.