U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00182
  • Case Name: Reed v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 10, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • July 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Return Mail]
  • June 13, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Response (generic)]
  • December 21, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 04, 2017: [Response (generic)]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • September 28, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 30, 2017: [Order]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • May 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.