U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Ojeda v. Cornelison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 28, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 26, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • July 26, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Summons Issued]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.