U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00233
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. Corizon LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Judgment]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 07, 2018: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Supplement]
  • June 12, 2017: [Errata]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.