U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00232
  • Case Name: Russo v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [USCA Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 30, 2019: [Corrective Entry]
  • July 30, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 25, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: [Order]
  • November 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 23, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • March 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Receipt]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • November 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • May 31, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • May 31, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • May 31, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • May 31, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.