U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00243
  • Case Name: Justice-Fleming v. Albertson's, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 08, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 15, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • August 08, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
July, 2017
  • July 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2017: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 30, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • June 14, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.