U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00242
  • Case Name: Gillenwater v. Suko et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Return Mail]
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 14, 2017: [Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Hearing]
  • June 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2017: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 07, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • June 07, 2017: [Clarify]
  • June 05, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Complaint]
  • June 05, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.