U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00245
  • Case Name: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Ochoa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • September 29, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 29, 2017: [Bill of Costs]
  • September 29, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 29, 2017: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Default Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Proposed Orders]
  • July 14, 2017: [Entry of Default]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 05, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 05, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.