U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00246
  • Case Name: Adams v. Carlin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 30, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 15, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
  • October 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 12, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2018
  • September 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 14, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Discovery]
  • August 24, 2018: [Response (generic)]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • July 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 27, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 07, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Seal]
  • February 20, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Consents (All are in)]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Consent Filed]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • November 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 07, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • June 06, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.