U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Davis v. Tony Ventures, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • February 02, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Report of Mediation]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • December 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 04, 2017: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • December 04, 2017: [Seal]
  • December 04, 2017: [Seal Document]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 27, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 21, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 03, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 22, 2017: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 07, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 07, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • July 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • June 23, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 15, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.