U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00249
  • Case Name: Hunter v. Darymple et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 02, 2017: [Judgment]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Return Mail]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Return Mail]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 30, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Complaint]
  • June 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • June 07, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 07, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.