U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00244
  • Case Name: Beavers v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 03, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 12, 2017: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • June 14, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
  • June 07, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 07, 2017: [Receipt]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 07, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.