U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00250
  • Case Name: Xerox Corporation v. United Micro Data, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Judgment - Default]
  • October 13, 2017: [Default Judgment]
  • October 05, 2017: [Clerks Entry of Default]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Entry of Default]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 07, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 07, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.