U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00253
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Mountain Care Pharmacy Idaho, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 10, 2018: [Settlement Conference]
  • January 10, 2018: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Protective Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • November 16, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • September 22, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 11, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • September 11, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Status Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2017
  • June 08, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.