U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00254
  • Case Name: Wisdom v. Gugino
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 05, 2019: [USCA Memorandum]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [USCA Order]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 19, 2018: [Receipt]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 03, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Appellants Reply Brief]
  • October 05, 2017: [Appellees Brief]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Excerpt of Record]
  • September 06, 2017: [Appellants Brief]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: [Certificate of Readiness]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Strike]
  • June 30, 2017: [Designations of Record]
  • June 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing BK Appeal]
  • June 08, 2017: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.