U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Taylor v. Riley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 09, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 24, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Sanctions]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 07, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • August 28, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • August 28, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 28, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 28, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • August 28, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • August 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 25, 2017: [Strike]
  • August 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 25, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 25, 2017: [Errata]
  • August 24, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order]
  • August 10, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 09, 2017: [Declaration]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Errata]
  • July 27, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • July 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 25, 2017: [Stay]
  • July 25, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 24, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • July 08, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 07, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • June 12, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 10, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.