U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00256
  • Case Name: Thomas v. Cassia County et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Expedite]
  • December 07, 2020: [Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 25, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 11, 2020: [Response to Motion]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Supplement]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Response (generic)]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Discovery]
  • May 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 30, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 30, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • March 18, 2019: [Judgment under Rule 54(b)]
  • March 17, 2019: [Reconsideration]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Order]
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Continue]
  • October 10, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order]
  • September 21, 2018: [Errata]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 12, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 12, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 12, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 11, 2018: [Errata]
  • September 11, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 10, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 08, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 08, 2018: [Declaration]
  • September 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 07, 2018: [Sealed Document]
  • September 07, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • August 27, 2018: [Seal]
  • August 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 09, 2018: [Affidavit of Service]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 19, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 13, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 15, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2018: [Notice of Substitution]
  • March 13, 2018: [Protective Order]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • September 19, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 12, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Bond]
  • June 13, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 12, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.