U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00258
  • Case Name: Jacquot v. Looking Glass Antiques, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 09, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • August 09, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 14, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 13, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 06, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • July 06, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 05, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 05, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • June 23, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 22, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2017: [Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 14, 2017: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • June 14, 2017: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • June 14, 2017: [Complaint]
  • June 14, 2017: [Receipt]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.