U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Hayes v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 06, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 15, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • October 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 08, 2017: [Supplement]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 24, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • August 16, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 16, 2017: [Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case]
June, 2017
  • June 16, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 16, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 16, 2017: [Complaint]
  • June 16, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 16, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.