U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00261
  • Case Name: Garfield v. Armstrong
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 20, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Seal]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • September 29, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • September 29, 2017: [File Excess Pages]
  • September 29, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order]
  • September 21, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Withdrawal of a document]
  • August 14, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • August 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • August 03, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 01, 2017: [Default Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • June 26, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 16, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.