U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Schaeffer et al v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Order]
  • November 22, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • September 20, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • September 08, 2017: [Strike]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Reminder Notice- 30 day]
  • August 18, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • August 18, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 17, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 17, 2017: [Dismiss]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • July 21, 2017: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • July 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 20, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 19, 2017: [Receipt]
  • June 19, 2017: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • June 19, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 19, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.