U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Berryhill
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 20, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 08, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 11, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 16, 2017: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Administrative Record]
  • October 11, 2017: [Answer to Petition for Review]
September, 2017
  • September 12, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • September 12, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Procedural Order (SS)]
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 19, 2017: [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • June 19, 2017: [Petition for Review]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.