U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Citizens Allied for Integrity and Accountability, Inc. et al v. Schultz et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 08, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 01, 2019: [Response to Motion]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Stay]
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 26, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 19, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 12, 2018: [Objection to Bill of Costs]
  • September 10, 2018: [Alter Judgment]
  • September 07, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 29, 2018: [Attorney Fees]
  • August 29, 2018: [Bill of Costs]
  • August 29, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 13, 2018: [Judgment]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 05, 2018: [Memorandum/Brief (generic)]
  • June 05, 2018: [File Amicus Brief]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • June 01, 2018: [Leave to File Document]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 15, 2018: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order]
  • February 16, 2018: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • February 14, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 08, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Consent Filed]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 31, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • August 31, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • August 18, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 11, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • June 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.