U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00257
  • Case Name: Barry Heck v. L&W Stone Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 06, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Entry of Default]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • February 06, 2018: [Service]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 21, 2017: [Service]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order]
August, 2017
  • August 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • June 21, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 21, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.