U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00265
  • Case Name: Goodrick v. Idaho Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • September 08, 2020: [Stay]
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [In Limine]
  • July 01, 2020: [Issuance]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 22, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Notice of Substitution]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 02, 2020: [Response to Motion]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • December 04, 2019: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2019: [Declaration]
  • December 04, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Removal of Attorney From Electronic Notice]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Substitution]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 12, 2019: [Withdrawal of a document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 30, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • May 06, 2019: [Joinder]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • May 06, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 06, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Joinder]
  • April 29, 2019: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 23, 2019: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2019: [Joinder]
  • April 04, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • April 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2019: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 06, 2019: [Certificate of Clerk]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order]
  • March 06, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Request]
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2018
  • March 08, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 08, 2018: [Alter Judgment]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order]
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • February 21, 2018: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 02, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Disqualify Judge]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • July 03, 2017: [Request for Reassignment to a District Judge]
June, 2017
  • June 22, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • June 22, 2017: [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • June 22, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.