U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00125
  • Case Name: Crow v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Reply (generic)]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Response (generic)]
  • August 08, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order]
  • June 22, 2018: [Memorandum Decision]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 22, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 24, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Corrective Entry]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.