U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00045
  • Case Name: Mitchell v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Request]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Judgment]
  • December 29, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Response to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Letter]
  • June 26, 2017: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • June 26, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • June 26, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • June 26, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.