U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00277
  • Case Name: Newell v. Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Idaho et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 14, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 07, 2018: [Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 07, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2018: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 05, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 02, 2018: [Joinder]
  • February 02, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 02, 2018: [Protective Order]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of Substitution]
  • November 10, 2017: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 03, 2017: [Declaration]
  • November 03, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 17, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 06, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Declaration]
  • September 27, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 27, 2017: [Change Venue]
  • September 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
  • August 25, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
  • August 24, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • August 24, 2017: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order]
  • August 15, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • July 24, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 24, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Joinder]
  • July 13, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 05, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • June 29, 2017: [Return of Service/Process Assumed]
  • June 28, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • June 28, 2017: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.