U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00278
  • Case Name: USA v. Funds held at Capital One Bank, Account No. xxxx5193, up to the amount of $120,000.00
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 09, 2018: [Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 05, 2018: [Affidavit in Support]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 01, 2018: [Default Judgment]
  • February 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Declaration]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: [Service by Publication]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion for Service]
  • October 25, 2017: [Service]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • July 07, 2017: [Sealed Document]
  • July 06, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 28, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.