U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cv-00280
  • Case Name: Handel v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 08, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 05, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order]
  • January 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
  • October 05, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order]
  • September 12, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 13, 2017: [Errata]
  • July 13, 2017: [Pro Hac Vice Appearance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Docket Annotation]
  • June 29, 2017: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.