U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00279
  • Case Name: Reidle v. Maverik, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Status Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Order]
  • January 29, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 01, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Consent Filed]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2017: [Discovery Plan]
  • October 12, 2017: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline]
  • September 21, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 05, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Status Report]
  • July 05, 2017: [Litigation Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.