U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00282
  • Case Name: Bartell v. Yordy
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2019: [Memorandum Decision]
  • September 26, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 11, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • February 11, 2019: [Reply (generic)]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 11, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • December 17, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 05, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2018
  • March 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2018: [Corrective Entry]
  • March 13, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Lodged Document (Unsealed)]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice of Summary Judgment]
  • January 29, 2018: [Dismiss]
  • January 29, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Consents (All are in)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2017: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags]
  • October 10, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2017: [Consent Filed]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Order of Conditional Filing]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Assign Pris/Pro Se IFP]
  • July 03, 2017: [Stay]
  • July 03, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 03, 2017: [Statement of Prisoner Trust Fund Account]
  • July 03, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.