U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00295
  • Case Name: Dodd et al v. Stout Flying Service, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 18, 2018: [Stipulation]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 15, 2018: [Litigation Plan/Scheduling Conf Form]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Expired 60 Day ddl re Consents]
November, 2017
  • November 10, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 10, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Litigation Order]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice to file Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Availability Setting Deadline]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Case Number Change]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 13, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • July 13, 2017: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.